Multiplication of 2-digit Numbers with Larger Numbers

Complete the test and get an award.

Do not use a calculator, please.
Question 1
Multiply:
132 x 17 =
Answer:
Question 2
Multiply:
212 x 33 =
Answer:
Question 3
Multiply:
421 x 11 =
Answer:
Question 4
Multiply:
284 x 19 =
Answer:
Question 5
Multiply:
368 x 23 =
Answer:
Question 6
Multiply:
177 x 39 =
Answer:
Question 7
Multiply:
116 x 43 =
Answer:
Question 8
Multiply:
453 x 35 =
Answer:
Question 9
Multiply:
521 x 27 =
Answer:
Question 10
Multiply:
475 x 36 =
Answer:
Question 11
Multiply:
289 x 42 =
Answer:
Question 12
Multiply:
357 x 13 =
Answer:
Question 13
Multiply:
486 x 44 =
Answer:
Question 14
Multiply:
153 x 25 =
Answer:
Question 15
Multiply:
349 x 38 =
Answer:



Contact email:

 
Copyright © 2005-2017.